+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Capital Budget. (View Original Bill)
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.