+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 5/21/2019.
- Chapter 414, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- Vote on final passage will be reconsidered.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, failed; yeas, 26; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading.
- Failed to receive a sixty percent majority vote.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at time TBA. (Committee Materials)
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CB 19). (View 1st Substitute)
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Capital Budget. (View Original Bill)
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor