+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/25/2021*.
- Chapter 253, 2021 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 53; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LCTA - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LAWS 21). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Workplace Standards. (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. (View Original Bill)
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.