+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/25/2021.
- Chapter 319, 2021 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 69; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment not adopted.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Law & Justice. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 21). (View 2nd Substitute)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety. (View Original Bill)
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor