+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ED - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education. (View Original Bill)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.