+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ENVI - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor