+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Referred to Transportation.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- TR - Majority; do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Amendment
1087 AMH TAKK RUSS 019
ADOPTED 03/02/2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor