+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 16, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HCW 19). (View 1st Substitute)
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. (View Original Bill)
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.