+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 288, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- NRP - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Vote on third reading will be reconsidered.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (AGNR 13).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- AGNR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM.
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources.