+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 16, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- GOV - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Governmental Operations.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LG 13).
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- LG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.