+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- BH - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HCW 21). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. (View Original Bill)
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor