+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/25/2021.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 56, 2021 Laws. (View Session Law)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSRR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- And refer to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
- HLTC - Majority; without recommendation. (Majority Report)
- Referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 21). (View 2nd Substitute)
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- CYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. (View Original Bill)
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor