+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- GGIT - Majority; do pass.
- GGIT - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM.
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Gen Govt & Info Tech (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On December 23, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.