+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 2.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- HCW - Majority; do pass.
- HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
1044 AMH CODY MORI 023
NOT CONSIDERED 02/22/2013
1044 AMH RODN MORI 018
ADOPTED 02/22/2013
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor