+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 4/14/2021.
- Chapter 23, 2021 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- CRJ - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. (View Original Bill)
On December 22, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor