+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- FIN - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- FIN - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LG - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- LG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- FIN - Majority; do pass LG 13 bill proposed by Local Government.
- FIN - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor