+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- TRAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor