+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/25/2021.
- Chapter 22, 2021 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 3, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- BFST - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CPB 21). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. (View Original Bill)
On December 18, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor