+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On December 8, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.