+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On December 8, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor