+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 60, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 6. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- FIET - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- And refer to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.
- TRAN - Majority; without recommendation. (Majority Report)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CPB - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. (View Original Bill)
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor