+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 179, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 80; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- GOS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LG - Majority; do pass.
- LG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On December 8, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Amendment
1013 AMS GOS S2789.1
ADOPTED 04/09/2015