+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 13).
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 3.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On December 3, 2012 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Amendments (14)
1007-S AMH SHMK LONG 536
WITHDRAWN 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH SHMK LONG 541
WITHDRAWN 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH SHMK LONG 543
ADOPTED 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH SHMK H2034.1
ADOPTED 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH ORCU H1989.2
FAILED 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH ORCU H1996.2
FAILED 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH ORCU H1998.2
FAILED 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH KRET H2001.2
ADOPTED 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH KRET H2001.1
WITHDRAWN 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH ORCU H1986.2
ADOPTED 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH KRET H2000.2
FAILED 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH KRET H1993.2
WITHDRAWN 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH KRET H1995.1
WITHDRAWN 03/09/2013
1007-S AMH KRET H1988.1
FAILED 03/09/2013
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor