+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554)
On April 6, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 554 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB699ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 3
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 002363200
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor