+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 14, 2010 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Delegates: Janis, O'Bannon, Watts
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senators: Miller J.C., Northam, Ruff
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- REJECTED (19-Y 78-N)
- Senate substitute with amendments rejected by House 10105805D-S1 (19-Y 78-N)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105805D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Smith agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB767S1
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105805D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (75-Y 23-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (75-Y 23-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (14-Y 7-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103953D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 11, 2010: Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2010: VOTE: --- REJECTED (19-Y 78-N)
March 8, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (75-Y 23-N)
February 12, 2010: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (14-Y 7-N)
February 11, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (98)
Type:
Primary Sponsor