+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N)
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105091D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ94S1
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105091D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103673D
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2010: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N)
February 16, 2010: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor