+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ93ER)
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 047886748
On January 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 047886748
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor