+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ92ER)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Certificate, Oath and Confirmation Review
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101953D
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2016: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2016: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2016: Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor