+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate (SR91ER)
- Read third time
- Ruling of Chair Not Sustained (8-Y 29-N)
- Chair rules Resolution is not properly before Senate
- Reading waived (38-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SR91S1
- Read second time
- Agreed to by Senate (24-Y 9-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 21103239D-S1 (Bell)
- Read second time
- Substitute by Senator Bell agreed to 21103239D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 21102854D
+ − Votes (4)
January 27, 2021: Reading waived (38-Y 1-N)
January 27, 2021: Ruling of Chair Not Sustained (8-Y 29-N)
January 27, 2021: Agreed to by Senate (24-Y 9-N)
January 19, 2021: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor