+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ9ER)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 13, 2006 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 060402740
On December 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/11/06 060402740
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor