+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086256288
+ − Vote
February 4, 2008: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor