+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- No action taken by Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 966374649
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor