+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ89ER)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 20104601D
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 10, 2020: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Mamie E. Locke
Type:
Primary Sponsor