+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ89ER)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented
- Laid on Clerk's Desk 987578705
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor