+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ89ER)
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ89E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 047309772-E
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 047309772
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2004: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor