+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ87ER)
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended 40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 022043518-E
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 022043518
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2002: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor