+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 965355649