+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ86ER)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 20100329D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2020: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Barbara A. Favola
Type:
Primary Sponsor