+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ85ER)
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 964480705-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 964480705-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 964480705-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 960365188
+ − Votes (4)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor