+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ85ER)
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented