+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ76ER)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ76S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104031D-S1
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104031D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103593D