+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ76ER)
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 047605784
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 047605784
- Prefiled; 01/14/04
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor