+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ73ER)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
- Assigned P & E sub: Gubernatorial Appointments
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 20105195D
+ − Votes (6)
February 5, 2020: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2020: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
R. Creigh Deeds
Type:
Primary Sponsor