+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Tabled in Rules (15-Y 3-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 20105313D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ66E
- Amendment by Senator Ebbin agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 20105313D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2020: Tabled in Rules (15-Y 3-N)
February 3, 2020: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Adam P. Ebbin
Type:
Primary Sponsor