+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ62ER)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101797D
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2016: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor