+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ58ER)
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 021894432-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 021894432-S1
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 021894432-S1
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 022280432
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2002: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2002: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor