+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ58ER)
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102941D
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2012: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor