+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ53ER)
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 961577747-E
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 961577747
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1996: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor