+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ526ER)
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 996205759
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor