+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ509ER)
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Taken up for immediate consideration
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058565780
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 058565780
+ − Sponsors (139)
Type:
Primary Sponsor